OR HB2936 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 299, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 299, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
States legislative findings about racism and public safety. States legislative findings about racism and public safety. Requires Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to create uniform background checklist and standardized personal history questionnaire for use by law enforcement units in hiring public safety officers. Provides that law enforcement unit may not be required to use checklist and questionnaire for purposes of hiring corrections officers until July 1, 2023. Directs law enforcement units to adopt policies that set standards for speech and expression by police officers and reserve officers. Requires employers to provide employment information to law enforcement units for purpose of hiring public safety officers. Exempts law enforcement units from prohibition on employer access to personal social media accounts.
Title
Relating to law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 299, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Cate, Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 2--Grayber, Hayden. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard, Thatcher. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Taylor. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Bynum, Noble. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Leif, Nearman. |
2021-04-20 | House | Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Equitable Policing. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |