OR HB2935 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 239, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 239, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits authority of school district to become member of voluntary organization that administers interscholastic activities unless organization implements equity focused policies that meet certain requirements. Limits authority of school district to become member of voluntary organization that administers interscholastic activities unless organization implements policy that prohibits discrimination based on race, color or national origin] equity focused policies that meet certain requirements. Clarifies meaning of race to include natural hair, hair texture, hair type and protective hairstyles for purposes of prohibited discrimination under antidiscrimination statutes. Clarifies that valid dress code or policy may not have disproportionate adverse impact on members of protected class to extent that is greater than impact on persons generally.
Title
Relating to discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 239, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Robinson. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Robinson; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman. |
2021-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |