OR HB2935 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 239, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Limits authority of school district to become member of voluntary organization that administers interscholastic activities unless organization implements equity focused policies that meet certain requirements. Limits authority of school district to become member of voluntary organization that administers interscholastic activities unless organization implements policy that prohibits discrimination based on race, color or national origin] equity focused policies that meet certain requirements. Clarifies meaning of race to include natural hair, hair texture, hair type and protective hairstyles for purposes of prohibited discrimination under antidiscrimination statutes. Clarifies that valid dress code or policy may not have disproportionate adverse impact on members of protected class to extent that is greater than impact on persons generally.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseChapter 239, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2022.
2021-06-11HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-02SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Robinson.
2021-06-02SenateThird reading. Carried by Frederick, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Robinson; Excused, 1--Heard.
2021-06-01SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-05-19SenateWork Session held.
2021-05-17SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-13SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-29SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-04-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-28HouseThird reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Nearman.
2021-04-27HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-04-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-23HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-08HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-03-08HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-15HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2021-01-29HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2935
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2935/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2935/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2935/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2935/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32081
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=518236
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32549
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=526700

Bill Comments 750

feedback