OR HB2935 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 438, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 438, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pharmacies to notify person to whom prescription drug is dispensed of availability of prescription reader. Requires pharmacies to provide prescription reader to person who is blind. Exempts pharmacies located in correctional institutions] institutional drug outlets from requirements. Defines "prescription reader." Requires State Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to prescription drugs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 438, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 20, 2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 40; Nays, 19--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-23 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2019-04-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 19--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika. |
2019-04-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |