OR HB2931 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 519, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 519, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Agriculture, in consultation with Oregon Health Authority and Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission, to establish cannabis reference laboratory to support enforcement of cannabis regulation. Requires Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission to study cannabis. Directs commission to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary not later than September 15, 2024.] Directs State Department of Agriculture, in consultation with Oregon Health Authority and Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission, to establish cannabis reference laboratory to support enforcement of cannabis regulation. Includes laboratory licensed by commission in definition of "licensee" for purposes of regulation of adult use cannabis. Prohibits laboratory from holding any other adult use cannabis license issued by commission. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to cannabis; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | House | Chapter 519, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Woods. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 1--Girod; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Carried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-05-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Cate, Diehl; Excused, 1--Nelson. |
2023-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-08 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |