OR HB2929 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 518, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Water Resources Department to seek injunctive relief if person has engaged, or is about to engage, in activity that is or will be violation of certain water laws. Authorizes Water Resources Department to seek injunctive relief if person has engaged, or is about to engage, in activity that is or will be violation of certain water laws. Sunsets injunctive authority on January 2, 2030. Instructs department to report, on or before September 15, 2028, to committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to water on department's use of injunctive authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the enforcement of water laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-15HouseChapter 518, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
2023-07-31HouseGovernor signed.
2023-06-27SenatePresident signed.
2023-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Knopp.
2023-06-23SenateMeek, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye.
2023-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 7--Anderson, Bonham, Findley, Girod, Knopp, Smith DB, Weber; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher.
2023-06-22SenateCarried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-21SenateCarried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent.
2023-06-20SenateSecond reading.
2023-06-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2023-05-10SenateWork Session held.
2023-04-26SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-04-17SenateReferred to Natural Resources.
2023-04-13SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-04-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 20--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Diehl, Elmer, Helfrich, Hieb, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Smith G, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 7--Bynum, Goodwin, Javadi, McIntire, Nathanson, Pham H, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Cramer, Speaker Rayfield.
2023-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-11HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2023 Calendar.
2023-04-10HouseSecond reading.
2023-04-07HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2023-04-03HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2929
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2929/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2929/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2929/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2929/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23362
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24241
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77411
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77267
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65880
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77175
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266987
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266595
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268954
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77602
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270052
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78127
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78283
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271679
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271807
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273269
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79800
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35061
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=573170
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35711
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=589507

Bill Comments

feedback