OR HB2927 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts Interstate Compact for Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote.
Title
Relating to the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 23--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 3--Boone, Kennemer, Smith G. |
2017-05-23 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |