OR HB2922 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 87, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 87, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases surcharge collected for issuance of Crater Lake National Park registration plates. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Crater Lake National Park registration plates; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 87, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Hayden, Parrish, Post; Excused, 3--Boone, Clem, Gorsek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-02-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |