OR HB2918 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 624, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 624, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local governments, and allows mass transit districts or transportation districts, to prepare and submit to Department of Land Conservation and Development inventory of surplus real property. Requires local governments, and allows mass transit districts or transportation districts, to prepare and submit to Department of Land Conservation and Development inventory of surplus real property. Directs department to submit report on surplus real property to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to housing no later than February 1 of each even-numbered year. Establishes alternative process for city to sell real property for purpose of developing affordable housing. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to publicly-owned real property; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 624, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-14 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |