OR HB2916 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Blue-Green Timber Economy Task Force. Establishes Blue-Green Timber Economy Task Force. Establishes Blue-Green Agricultural Economy Task Force. Establishes Blue-Green Marine Economy Task Force. Requires task forces to study and make recommendations on technologies and practices that benefit economy and environment. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to strategies for environmentally beneficial economic growth; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2916 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2916/Introduced |