OR HB2914 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Chapter 538, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates April of each year as Arab-American Heritage Month. Designates April of each year as Arab-American Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Arab-American Heritage Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-30HouseChapter 538, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2022.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-06-17SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Rules.
2021-06-16SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Evans.
2021-06-14HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-06-09HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback