OR HB2914 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 199, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 199, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that certain Metro lands be zoned for employment land of state significance. Allows redesignation of those lands by local government. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to acknowledged urban reserves in Washington County; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 199, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Marsh, McKeown, McLain; Excused, 1--Barreto. |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |