OR HB2912 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset of pilot program for provision of legal services to adults in custody serving sentences at Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Extends sunset of pilot program for provision of legal services to adults in custody serving sentences at Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Appropriates moneys from General Fund, for biennium beginning July 1, 2021, to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission for purposes of funding program. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to legal services for adults in custody; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |