OR HB2908 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 665, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 665, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates position of Veteran Volunteer Coordinator in Department of Veterans' Affairs and specifies responsibilities. Requires report to Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2020. Limits biennial expenditures from certain lottery moneys received by department for purpose of implementing and administering position. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to volunteer coordinator services for veterans; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 665, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Monroe, Roblan, Thomsen, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Carried over to 06-30 by unanimous consent. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-06-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Boone, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bentz, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-14 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |