OR HB2906 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 298, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 298, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that, if monthly salary of member of individual account program of Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan does not exceed $3,333, instead of $2,500, Public Employees Retirement Board shall credit all employee contributions made by member to employee account and credit no employee contributions made by member to employee pension stability account. Directs Public Employees Retirement Board to study methods for allowing members of Public Employees Retirement System to certify that member will earn less than $30,000 in calendar year so that board does not credit employee contributions to employee pension stability account.] Provides that, if monthly salary of member of individual account program of Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan does not exceed $3,333, instead of $2,500, Public Employees Retirement Board shall credit all employee contributions made by member to employee account and credit no employee contributions made by member to employee pension stability account.
Title
Relating to employee contributions to the Public Employees Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 298, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams, Evans. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark; Excused, 3--Alonso Leon, Nearman, Power. |
2021-05-06 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-15 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |