OR HB2906 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 166, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 166, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Geographic Information Council within office of State Chief Information Officer. Specifies membership, purposes and powers of council. Requires public bodies, beginning in 2020, to share certain geospatial framework data under specified conditions and with specific limitations. Requires State Chief Information Officer to appoint individual to oversee and manage State Chief Information Officer's duties and functions under provisions of Act. Requires individual to secure geospatial data library, protect availability and integrity of information in library and provide secure electronic access to library for purposes of sharing geospatial framework data. Establishes Oregon Geographic Information Council Fund and appropriates moneys in fund to State Chief Information Officer for purposes of Act. Permits State Chief Information Officer to accept gifts, grants, donations and contributions from federal government, agencies of federal government or other sources and to agree to conditions placed on gift, grant, donation or contribution that is in accordance with Act and other law. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day after adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to sharing geographic information; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 166, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Boquist, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nearman, Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Post, Reschke; Excused, 3--Boone, McKeown, Piluso. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-04-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |