OR HB2904 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Chapter 213, (2013 Laws): 90 days after Sine Die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Chapter 213, (2013 Laws): 90 days after Sine Die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extends sunset for property tax exemption for cargo containers.
Title
Relating to exemption from property taxation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Chapter 213, (2013 Laws): 90 days after Sine Die. |
2013-05-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Prozanski. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-03-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vega Pederson. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2013-03-19 | House | Second reading. |
2013-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |