OR HB2900 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extends sunset of exemption from property taxation for qualified machinery and equipment that is used in food processing. Authorizes governing body of county to adopt ordinance or resolution rendering exemption inoperative for county and all other taxing districts within county. Notwithstanding adoption by county of ordinance or resolution under Act, allows exempt machinery and equipment in county to receive exemption for number of years for which machinery and equipment is eligible under exemption statute. Authorizes governing body of county to adopt ordinance or resolution rendering exemption operative again. Provides that ordinances and resolutions authorized under Act must remain in effect for at least three consecutive property tax years. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the taxation of qualified machinery and equipment used in food processing; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Revenue by prior reference.
2019-04-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-25HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2019-02-06HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback