OR HB2899 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 84, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 84, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that ports may enter into intergovernmental agreements for any purpose permitted under ORS chapter 190.
Title
Relating to intergovernmental agreements by ports.
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 84, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-03-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-14 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade. |
2017-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |