OR HB2898 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Public Hearing scheduled.
Pending: House Veterans and Emergency Management Committee
Hearing: Mar 4 @ 3:15 pm in Remote 170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes surtax on income tax liability. Imposes surtax on income tax liability. Transfers proceeds of income tax surtax to Resiliency Grant Fund. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an income tax surtax to fund emergency preparedness; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HousePublic Hearing scheduled.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback