OR HB2897 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Early Childhood Equity Fund. Authorizes Early Learning Division to make grants from fund for purpose of supporting culturally specific early learning, early childhood and parent support programs in this state and to promote capacity of culturally specific organizations to deliver programs. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to grants for early childhood programs; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Student Success by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Student Success by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Student Success by prior reference. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Student Success. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |