OR HB2896 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Office of Emergency Management to conduct annual multidisciplinary, all-hazards emergency response exercise. Directs Office of Emergency Management to conduct annual multidisciplinary, all-hazards emergency response exercise. Directs certain state entities to conduct annual internal exercise to test elements of emergency preparedness. Directs counties to conduct quarterly tabletop exercises related to emergency response. Directs office to assist state entities and counties in carrying out required exercises. Directs office to consult with Oregon Homeland Security Council to determine priorities for subjects of exercises.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness exercises.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] |
Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |