OR HB2892 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Veterans and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates moneys to Department of State Police, for State Fire Marshal, for personnel costs related to Oregon Safety Assessment Program (OrSAP). Appropriates moneys to Department of State Police, for State Fire Marshal, for personnel costs related to Oregon Safety Assessment Program (OrSAP).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Oregon Safety Assessment Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-01-28HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback