OR HB2885 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds extended warranties to list of collateral charges for which manufacturer may need to compensate consumer when consumer returns motor vehicle that manufacturer cannot conform to manufacturer's express warranty. Requires that manufacturer replace, refund cost of or return to consumer aftermarket items installed in or on motor vehicle that manufacturer cannot conform to manufacturer's express warranty. Revises formula for calculating reasonable use allowance for motor vehicle. Allows, rather than compels, consumer to participate in informal dispute resolution with manufacturer.
Title
Relating to remedies for manufacturer failures to conform motor vehicles to terms of express warranties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2885 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2885/Introduced |