OR HB2884 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 237, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 237, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends time for recording partition plat incorporating city or county's permit validating unit of land to 365 days. Extends time for recording partition plat incorporating city or county's permit validating unit of land to 365 days. Allow recording of all existing validating permits before December 31, 2022.
Title
Relating to validation of lawfully established units of land.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 237, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |