OR HB2883 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Oregon Public Places Are Safe Places Investment Fund. Establishes Oregon Public Places Are Safe Places Investment Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Office of Emergency Management for implementation of strategies for identifying and developing staging areas for emergency response. Creates advisory committee within office to provide recommendations and advice regarding expenditures from fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to development of staging areas for emergency response.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback