OR HB2882 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Homeland Security Council to develop updated list of equipment for purposes of emergency preparedness equipment grant program. Directs Oregon Homeland Security Council to develop updated list of equipment for purposes of emergency preparedness equipment grant program. Directs council to prioritize preparedness equipment necessary for urban search and rescue teams. Directs Office of Emergency Management to seek to prioritize grant requests from certain applicants for search and rescue purposes. Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds under Article XI-Q of Oregon Constitution for grant program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2882 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2882/Introduced |