OR HB2877 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes reserve officers sponsored by law enforcement unit to pay for training as police with cash and G.I. Bill education benefits. Authorizes reserve officers sponsored by law enforcement unit to pay for training as police with cash and G.I. Bill education benefits. Requires Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to increase training class sizes by up to 25 percent as necessary to train sponsored reserve officers. Requires reserve officer to remain with law enforcement unit for at least three years after certification and allows Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to suspend or revoke certification if reserve officer fails to comply without good cause. Requires Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to conduct study of impact of measure on state and local public safety budgets, recruitment of officers and maintenance of public safety and to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to public safety. Sunsets January 2, 2028.
Title
Relating to training of police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2877 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2877/Introduced |