OR HB2872 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Imagination Library of Oregon Program to provide free book each month to eligible children, encourage children to develop love of reading and learning, and improve third-grade reading proficiency and high school graduation rates. Directs Department of Early Learning and Care to develop, implement and administer Oregon Imagination Library Project to improve reading proficiency and high school graduation rates by providing enrolled children with one age-appropriate book per child each month.] Establishes Imagination Library of Oregon Program to provide free book each month to eligible children, encourage children to develop love of reading and learning, and improve third-grade reading proficiency and high school graduation rates. Directs Department of Early Learning and Care to implement program. Establishes Oregon Imagination Library Account within Department of Early Learning and Care Fund for purposes of funding project] program. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to encouragement of reading in young children; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-31 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-31 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |