OR HB2871 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 727, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 727, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Open Educational Resources Grant Program within Higher Education Coordinating Commission. Requires commission, subject to availability of funds, to award grants on competitive basis to public universities, community colleges or consortia of public universities and community colleges to promote use of open educational resources. Requires commission to employ open educational resource specialist to collaborate with public universities and community colleges in fostering use of open educational resources. Appropriates moneys to commission. Requires public universities and community colleges to prominently designate courses whose course materials consist exclusively of open or free textbooks or low-cost or no-cost course materials. Requires commission to coordinate with public universities and community colleges to identify open educational resources to be adopted as primary instructional material for at least 30] 15 courses. Requires commission to submit report to Legislative Assembly on status of implementing open resources provisions by December 1, 2015. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to higher education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 727, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-07-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2015-06-30 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-23 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |