OR HB2868 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates income tax credit for foster parents. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for foster parents; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] |
Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Motion to withdraw from Revenue failed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 36--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Wilde, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Evans, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |