OR HB2867 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Desalination. Establishes Oregon Desalination Authority. Directs authority to study development and maintenance of desalination facilities in state.] Establishes Task Force on Desalination. Directs task force to study creation of statewide desalination program. Requires task force to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2024. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to desalination; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Virgle Osborne [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-03-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |