OR HB2864 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 397, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 397, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each community college and public university to establish process for recommending, and providing oversight for implementation of, cultural competency standards for institution and institution's employees. Lists requirements that process established by institution must satisfy.
Title
Relating to cultural competence at post-secondary institutions of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 397, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-26 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Kennemer, Reschke. |
2017-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed.Ayes, 45; Nays, 15--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |