OR HB2863 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Constitutional Convention Delegation to represent Legislative Assembly at any constitutional convention convened pursuant to Article V of United States Constitution to consider balanced budget amendment to United States Constitution. Limits scope of authority of delegation. Permits delegation to participate in convention only if convention is called by Congress of the United States on or before December 31, 2018. Establishes Article V Convention Oversight Committee to monitor and advise delegation and to discipline or replace delegates or alternates to delegation that do not comply with authority and limits placed on delegation. Directs Legislative Policy and Research Director to supply administrative support to delegation and oversight committee. Establishes Constitutional Convention Fund to provide funding to carry out duties of delegation and oversight committee. Sunsets June 30, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to constitutional conventions; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-02-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2863 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2863/Introduced |