OR HB2859 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to fill and utilize certain positions. Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to study and make recommendations regarding improvements to operations of department. Requires department to submit report on findings by January 1, 2023.] fill and utilize certain positions. Allocates lottery moneys from Veterans' Services Fund for specified purposes. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to veterans; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |