OR HB2859 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates privilege against disclosure for specified confidential communications and records created or maintained by Legislative Equity Office principal outreach officer. Provides exceptions. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to privileged communications; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Capitol Culture. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2859 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2859/Introduced |