OR HB2856 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to study and make recommendations regarding improvements to operations of department. Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to study and make recommendations regarding improvements to operations of department. Requires department to submit report on findings by January 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2856 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2856/Introduced |