OR HB2851 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for specified purposes related to emergency management for biennium beginning July 1, 2021. Directs Office of Emergency Management to study and make recommendations regarding improvements to operations of office. Requires office to submit report on findings by January 1, 2023.] Appropriates moneys from General Fund to specified state agencies for specified purposes related to emergency management for biennium beginning July 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to emergency management; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |