OR HB2849 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 594, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 594, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of state law regarding custody of children or youth who have run away from home or placement to apply to all runaways. Modifies standards for taking child into protective custody with or without court order. Permits application for protective custody order by declaration or sworn oral statement. Permits person conducting child abuse investigation involving child with suspicious physical injuries to take child into protective custody only for period of time necessary to ensure that child is immediately photographed and, within 48 hours, assessed by medical professional.
Title
Relating to protective custody of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 594, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Manning Jr. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Doherty, Smith G. |
2019-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-04 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2019-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |