OR HB2847 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Military Department for Service Member and Family Support Program in biennium beginning July 1, 2021. Directs Oregon Military Department to study and make recommendations regarding improvements to operations of department. Requires department to submit report on findings by January 1, 2023.] Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Military Department for Service Member and Family Support Program in biennium beginning July 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to the military; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |