OR HB2845 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 501, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Education to convene advisory group to develop statewide ethnic studies standards for adoption into existing statewide social studies standards for public kindergarten through grade 12. Directs department to adopt ethnic studies standards into existing statewide social studies standards for public kindergarten through grade 12. Sunsets advisory group on January 2, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to statewide social studies standards; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-13HouseChapter 501, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 29, 2017.
2017-06-29HouseGovernor signed.
2017-06-23SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 3--Knopp, Thatcher, Winters.
2017-06-15SenateSecond reading.
2017-06-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2017-06-13SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-06-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-06-08HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2017-06-08HousePassed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 15--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Hack, Kennemer, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 4--Boone, Clem, Doherty, Helm; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Hayden, Heard.
2017-06-08HouseMotion to refer to Ways and Means failed.Ayes, 25; Nays, 32--Alonso Leon, Barker, Barnhart, Bynum, Clem, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lininger, Lively, Malstrom, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Sollman, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 3--Boone, Doherty, Helm.
2017-06-08HouseThird reading. Carried by Hernandez.
2017-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-06HouseSecond reading.
2017-06-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2017-06-02HouseWork Session held.
2017-05-31HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2017-05-31HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-05-24HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2017-04-21HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2017-04-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2017-04-17HouseWork Session held.
2017-03-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-03-15HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Education.
2017-02-08HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2845
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2845/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2845/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2845/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2845/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2845/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2845/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25346
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26305
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=415135
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=415161
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=417037

Bill Comments

feedback