OR HB2844 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides, for purposes of certain statutes relating to taking of predatory animals, that terms "predatory animal" and "rodent" do not include beavers. Provides, for purposes of certain statutes relating to taking of predatory animals, that terms "predatory animal" and "rodent" do not include beavers. Instructs State Fish and Wildlife Commission to adopt rules related to taking of beavers. Instructs State Department of Fish and Wildlife to publish annual report related to taking of beavers and to make report available to public.
Title
Relating to the taking of beavers.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] |
Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2844 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2844/Introduced |