OR HB2843 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Occupational Safety and Health Division of Department of Consumer and Business Services to study potential safety benefits of screening replacement workers during labor dispute with employer that employs more than 100 employees in industry involving hazardous materials. Directs division to submit report to Legislative Assembly with findings.
Title
Relating to screening of replacement workers during labor dispute in industry involving hazardous materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] |
Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2843 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2843/Introduced |