OR HB2841 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to award grant moneys to eligible school-based health center pilot projects to expand access to health care services and improve health and education outcomes for students through telehealth. Directs Oregon Health Authority to award grant moneys to eligible school-based health center pilot projects to expand access to health care services and improve health and education outcomes for students through telehealth. Defines "telehealth." Establishes eligibility criteria for pilot projects. Directs authority to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on effectiveness and success of pilot projects not later than December 31, 2025. Sunsets January 2, 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to school nurses; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2841 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2841/Introduced |