OR HB2835 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 621, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each community college and public university to hire benefits navigator to assist students in determining eligibility and applying for federal, state and local benefits programs. Requires each community college and public university to hire benefits navigator to assist students in determining eligibility and applying for federal, state and local benefits programs. Requires community colleges and public universities to establish statewide consortium to enable benefits navigator to coordinate with benefits navigators at other institutions and to develop best practices. Requires community colleges and public universities to develop internal process to enable students to provide feedback and recommendations on how institution can better assist students in determining eligibility for benefits programs and applying for assistance under benefits programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to benefits programs for students at institutions of higher education; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 621, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2021.
2021-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-06-21SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-17HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 4--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 3--Morgan, Smith G, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Clem, Marsh, Rayfield.
2021-06-17HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-06-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-08HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-08HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-04HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-04HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2835
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2835/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2835/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2835/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2835/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31299
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32901
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=531703
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532978

Bill Comments

feedback