OR HB2834 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires dental care organization that contracts with coordinated care organization to provide oral health care services to low income seniors and veterans residing in geographic area served by coordinated care organization who do not have other coverage for oral health care services.
Title
Relating to health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-26 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |