OR HB2831 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides funding to peer-run organizations in Portland metropolitan area, southern Oregon region and eastern and central Oregon region to operate peer respite centers to provide peer respite services to individuals with mental illness who experience acute distress, anxiety or emotional pain. Requires Oregon Health Authority to adopt criteria for peer respite centers that receive funding and to monitor compliance. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to residential peer support for individuals with mental illness who are in crisis; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |