OR HB2831 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases corporate minimum tax imposed on S corporations with Oregon sales that exceed certain amount. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to corporate minimum tax; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2831 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2831/Introduced |