OR HB2830 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes process and requirements for establishing education savings accounts. Establishes process and requirements for establishing education savings accounts. Allows participating students to obtain grants from education savings accounts to pay for qualified education expenses for specified education expenses. Requires participating students to comply with examination requirements. First applies to 2024-2025 school year. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to education savings accounts; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Education.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback