OR HB2826 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies allocation formula for grants to children's advocacy centers. Modifies allocation formula for grants to children's advocacy centers. Establishes Child Abuse Assessment Account within State Treasury for purpose of grant program for children's advocacy centers. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Justice for purpose of funding program. Limits biennial expenditures by department for grant program from Child Abuse Assessment Account. Modifies authority of Advisory Council on Child Abuse Assessment to deposit contributions to Child Abuse Multidisciplinary Intervention Account and Child Abuse Assessment Account. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to child safety; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |